Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3452781

EP3452781 - SELF-CALIBRATING AND AUTONOMOUS MAGNETIC OBSERVATORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
05.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut Royal Meteorologique de Belgique
Avenue Circulaire 3
1180 Bruxelles / BE
[2019/11]
Inventor(s)01 / RASSON, Jean
Rue de Rocroi 51
5670 Viroinval / BE
02 / GONSETTE, Alexandre
Rue Max Buset 8
6567 Labuissière / BE
03 / HUMBLED, François
Rue d'Aremberg 18
5680 Gimnée / BE
 [2019/11]
Representative(s)Pecher, Nicolas , et al
Pecher & Partners
Rue Louis de Geer, 6
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2019/11]
Application number, filing date17717453.918.04.2017
[2019/11]
WO2017EP59196
Priority number, dateBE2016000532204.05.2016         Original published format: BE 201605322
[2019/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017190951
Date:09.11.2017
Language:FR
[2017/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3452781
Date:13.03.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017
[2019/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01C17/02, G01R33/02, G01V3/00
[2019/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/11]
TitleGerman:SELBSTKALIBRIERENDES UND AUTONOMES MAGNETISCHES OBSERVATORIUM[2019/11]
English:SELF-CALIBRATING AND AUTONOMOUS MAGNETIC OBSERVATORY[2019/11]
French:OBSERVATOIRE MAGNÉTIQUE AUTONOME ET AUTO-CALIBRÉ[2019/11]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/11]
03.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]  - H. U. AUSTER ET AL, "Automation of absolute measurement of the geomagnetic field", EARTH, PLANETS AND SPACE, (20070901), vol. 35, no. 10/S, doi:10.1186/BF03352041, pages 803 - 1014, XP055337350 [A] 1-19 * Sections 3 et 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/BF03352041
 [AD]  - O GRAVRAND ET AL, "On the calibration of a vectorial 4He pumped magnetometer", EARTH PLANETS SPACE, (20011001), vol. 53, no. 10, doi:10.1186/BF03351692, ISSN 1343-8832, pages 949 - 958, XP055017599 [AD] 1-19 * sections 3 et 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/BF03351692
 [A]  - Ivan Hrvoic ET AL, "Instruments and Methodologies for Measurement of the Earth's Magnetic Field", Geomagnetic Observations and Models, chapter 4, (20131001), ISBN 978-90-48-19858-0, XP055337832 [A] 1-19 * section 4 *
by applicant   - O. GRAVRAND; A. KHOKHLOV; J.L. LE MOUEL; J.M. LEGER, "On the calibration of a vectorial 4He pumped magnetometer", EARTH PLANETS SPACE, (2001), vol. 53, doi:doi:10.1186/BF03351692, pages 949 - 958, XP055017599

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/BF03351692
    - H.U. AUSTER; M. MANDEA; A. HEMSHORN; M. KORTE; E. PULZ, "GAUSS: Geomagnetic Automated System", PUBLS. INST. GEOPHYS. POL. ACAD. SC., (2007), page C-99