Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469224

EP3469224 - SLIDE BEARING, PLASTICS SLIDE ELEMENT, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR WEAR DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.10.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
28.06.2019Change - extension statespublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Igus GmbH
Spicher Str. 1a
51147 Köln / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / JANSA, Darius
Rondoweg 3
50765 Köln / DE
02 / SCHMER, Konstantin
Äußere Kanalstraße 193
50827 Köln / DE
03 / NIERMANN, Stefan
Auenhof 9
40882 Ratingen / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17718547.721.04.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP59571
Priority number, dateDE201620102133U21.04.2016         Original published format: DE 202016102133 U
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017182662
Date:26.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469224
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16C41/00, F16C17/24, F16C33/20, G01M13/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:GLEITLAGER, KUNSTSTOFFGLEITELEMENT, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSCHLEISSERKENNUNG[2019/16]
English:SLIDE BEARING, PLASTICS SLIDE ELEMENT, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR WEAR DETECTION[2019/16]
French:PALIER LISSE, ÉLÉMENT DE GLISSEMENT EN PLASTIQUE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'USURE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2019National basic fee paid 
06.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2019/16]
06.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
06.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Request for further processing for:06.03.2019Request for further processing filed
06.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
06.03.2019Request for further processing filed
06.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
06.03.2019Request for further processing filed
06.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
06.03.2019Request for further processing filed
06.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
06.03.2019Request for further processing filed
06.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
06.03.2019Request for further processing filed
06.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IY]DE10227677  (ARGOTECH GES FUER MESTECHNIK M [DE]) [I] 1-5,10,12-23 * paragraphs [0046] - [0061]; figures 2-7; claims 5,6 * [Y] 1-5,10,13,17-23;
 [IY]DE102004010348  (MERI ENTSORGUNGSTECH PAPIERIND [DE]) [I] 1-3,7,8,10,13-16,19,20 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figures 3-5; claims 1,3,4,6,13 * [Y] 1-3,7,8,13,17-23;
 [IY]US5701119  (JURRAS III MARK I [US]) [I] 1,5,13-19 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 40; figures 2-7 * [Y] 1-5,7,8,10,13,17-19,21-23;
 [IY]DE20104695U  (CORTS JOCHEN [DE]) [I] 1,2,4,9,11,17-23 * page 7, line 1 - page 13, line 7; figures 1-6; claims 8,13,14 * [Y] 1-5,7,8,13,17-23;
 [IY]DE2115506  (KLOECKNER WERKE AG) [I] 1,2,13-20 * page 5, line 12 - page 7, line 2; figures 1-6; claims 1,5,6 * [Y] 1-5,13,17-23
by applicantUS7534045
 US6501382
 WO2009127190
 DE102007009093
 DE10227677
 US3810147
 US3500373
 WO2014154800