Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3439702

EP3439702 - CONJUGATED C1 ESTERASE INHIBITOR AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shire Human Genetic Therapies, Inc.
300 Shire Way
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
[2019/07]
Inventor(s)01 / HOLMES, Kevin
300 Shire Way
Lexington MA 02421 / US
02 / NORTON, Angela, W.
300 Shire Way
Lexington MA 02421 / US
03 / PAN, Clark
300 Shire Way
Lexington MA 02421 / US
 [2019/07]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/07]
Application number, filing date17719409.904.04.2017
[2019/07]
WO2017US26001
Priority number, dateUS201662318003P04.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662318003 P
[2019/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017176798
Date:12.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3439702
Date:13.02.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017
[2019/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/60, A61K47/61
[2019/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/07]
Extension statesBA05.11.2018
ME05.11.2018
Validation statesMA05.11.2018
MD05.11.2018
TitleGerman:KONJUGIERTER C1-ESTERASE-INHIBITOR UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2019/07]
English:CONJUGATED C1 ESTERASE INHIBITOR AND USES THEREOF[2019/07]
French:INHIBITEUR DE C1 ESTÉRASE CONJUGUÉ ET SES UTILISATIONS[2019/07]
Entry into regional phase05.11.2018National basic fee paid 
05.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/07]
05.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2013138694  (ENZON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7,13-34,37-43,47-50 * page 1, lines 10-13; examples 2,2B; claims 1,2,6,7,11 * [I] 1-99;
 [AD]WO2012166622  (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [AD] 1-99 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0160] - [0164]; claims 1,2,13,15,16 *
by applicantUS6277375
 US8012476
 US8163881
 WO2011063348
 WO2012020096
 WO2013138643
 WO2014087299
 US2012232021
 EP0401384
 EP0154316
 WO9216221
 WO9534326
 WO0187922
 WO2005016974
 WO2012166622
 US7645860
 US7875708
 WO2011012850
    - KARNAUKHOVA, E., "CI-Esterase Inhibitor: Biological Activities and Therapeutic Applications", J HEMATOL THROMB DIS, (2013), vol. 1, page 113
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., "Basic local alignment search tool", J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999, pages 403 - 410, XP002949123

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., "Gapped BLAST and PSI-BLAST: a new generation of protein database search programs", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/25.17.3389, pages 3389 - 3402, XP002905950

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.17.3389
    - "Methods in Molecular Biology", Bioinformatics Methods and Protocols, HUMANA PRESS, (1999), vol. 132
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - CAI, S.; DAVIS, A. E., "Complement Regulatory Protein C1 Inhibitor Binds to Selectins and Interferes with Endothelial-Leukocyte Adhesion", J IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 171, pages 4786 - 4791, XP002987245
    - DUMONT, J. ET AL., "Monomeric Fc Fusions: Impact on Pharmacokinetic and Biological Activity of Protein Therapeutics", BIODRUGS, (2006), vol. 20, no. 3, doi:doi:10.2165/00063030-200620030-00002, pages 151 - 160, XP009082835

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-200620030-00002
    - ISHINO, T. ET AL., "Protein Structure and Folding: Half-life Extension of Biotherapeutics Modality by N-Glycosylation for the Engineering a Monomeric Fc Domain", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2013), vol. 288, pages 16529 - 16537
    - MALIK ET AL., EXP. HEMATOL., (1992), vol. 20, pages 1028 - 1035
    - KANG SH ET AL., CHEM COMMUN., (2000), pages 227 - 228
    - RESS DK; LINHARDT RJ, CURRENT ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, (2004), vol. 1, pages 31 - 46
    - PARK ET AL., "Carbohydrate-Mediated Polyethylene Glycol Conjugation of TSH Improves Its Pharmacological Properties", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (201303), vol. 154, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1210/en.2012-2010, pages 1373 - 1383, XP008160851

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.2012-2010