Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3433928

EP3433928 - HYBRID SOLAR PANEL EQUIPPED WITH A DEVICE FOR ATTACHMENT OF A HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
31.05.2019Change - extension statespublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dualsun (SAS)
2, rue Marc Donadille
CS 80001
13453 Marseille Cedex 13 / FR
[2019/05]
Inventor(s)01 / BROTTIER, Laetitia
2, rue Marc Donadille - CS 80001
13453 Marseille Cedex 13 / FR
02 / MOUTERDE, Jérôme
2, rue Marc Donadille - CS 80001
13453 Marseille Cedex 13 / FR
 [2019/05]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2019/05]
Application number, filing date17719649.024.03.2017
[2019/05]
WO2017FR50686
Priority number, dateFR2016005253224.03.2016         Original published format: FR 1652532
[2019/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017162993
Date:28.09.2017
Language:FR
[2017/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3433928
Date:30.01.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017
[2019/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02S30/10, H02S40/44
[2019/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/05]
TitleGerman:HYBRIDES SOLARPANEEL MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES WÄRMETAUSCHERS[2019/05]
English:HYBRID SOLAR PANEL EQUIPPED WITH A DEVICE FOR ATTACHMENT OF A HEAT EXCHANGER[2019/05]
French:PANNEAU SOLAIRE HYBRIDE EQUIPE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE[2019/05]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2018National basic fee paid 
24.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/05]
24.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE102011107393  (SOLVIS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-22 * paragraphs [0067] - [0098]; figures 1a,1b,7 *;
 [AD]US2015349178  (RUBIO MICHAEL R [US] ET AL) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE102011122126  (PA ID AUTOMATION & VERMARKTUNG GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - A. KROISS ET AL, "Development of a Seawater-proof Hybrid Photovoltaic/thermal (PV/T) Solar Collector", ENERGY PROCEDIA, NL, (20140101), vol. 52, doi:10.1016/j.egypro.2014.07.058, ISSN 1876-6102, pages 93 - 103, XP055323182 [AD] 1-22 * page 96; figures 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.egypro.2014.07.058
by applicantWO2012069750
 FR1156550
 WO2009149572
 DE102011122126
 DE102011107393
 US2015349178
 FR2967817
    - A. KROISS ET AL., "Development of a seawater-proof Hybrid Photovoltaic/thermal (PV/T) Solar Co//ector", ENERGY PROCEDIA, (20140101), vol. 52, doi:doi:10.1016/j.egypro.2014.07.058, pages 93 - 103, XP055323182

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.egypro.2014.07.058