Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464511

EP3464511 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING BTX BY CATALYTIC PYROLYSIS FROM BIOMASS WITHOUT RECYCLING OXYGENATED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.09.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IFP Energies nouvelles
1 & 4 Avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FEUGNET, Frederic
0017 Rue Pernon
69004 Lyon / FR
02 / LOPES FERREIRA, Nicolas
0034 Dom de la Croix de Pierre - test
28210 Croisilles / FR
03 / KASZTELAN, Slavik
0097 Qu Charles de Gaulle
69006 Lyon / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)IFP Energies nouvelles
Département Propriété Industrielle
Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize
BP3
69360 Solaize / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17720819.603.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP60548
Priority number, dateFR2016005489431.05.2016         Original published format: FR 1654894
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207201
Date:07.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464511
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C10G1/00, B01J23/06, B01J23/08, B01J23/745, B01J29/08, B01J29/18, B01J29/40, B01J29/65, C10B53/02, C10G1/08, C12P7/02, C12P7/52, C12R1/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BTX DURCH KATALYTISCHE PYROLYSE AUS BIOMASSE OHNE RÜCKFÜHRUNG VON OXYGENIERTEN VERBINDUNGEN[2019/15]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING BTX BY CATALYTIC PYROLYSIS FROM BIOMASS WITHOUT RECYCLING OXYGENATED COMPOUNDS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BTX PAR PYROLYSE CATALYTIQUE À PARTIR DE BIOMASSE SANS RECYCLE DE COMPOSÉS OXYGÉNÉS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2014134686  (SCHULTZ MICHAEL ANTHONY [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * figure 2 * * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0168] *;
 [A]US2014107306  (MAZANEC TERRY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0070] *;
 [A]  - YU-TING CHENG ET AL, "Production of Renewable Aromatic Compounds by Catalytic Fast Pyrolysis of Lignocellulosic Biomass with Bifunctional Ga/ZSM-5 Catalysts", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20111227), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:10.1002/anie.201107390, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 1387 - 1390, XP055068876 [A] 1-12 * page 1387 - page 1389 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201107390
 [A]  - TORREN R CARLSON ET AL, "Aromatic Production from Catalytic Fast Pyrolysis of Biomass-Derived Feedstocks", TOPICS IN CATALYSIS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20090114), vol. 52, no. 3, ISSN 1572-9028, pages 241 - 252, XP019689593 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [03.1] - paragraph [03.4] *
by applicantUS8277643
 WO2009111026
 WO2011031320
 US5173429
 WO0068407
 EP0117309
 US5593886
 US6368819
 WO9800558
 WO0208438
 WO2007117157
 WO2009151342
 US7704723
 US2007276447
 WO2010071697
 WO2009094485
 US2012252083
 WO2007115157
 WO2008115080
 US6340581
 US6136577
 US5807722
 US5821111
 WO2012131627
    - TAVOULAREAS, S., Combustion Technology, ANNUAL REVIEWS INC, (1991), vol. 16, pages 25 - 27
    - LOWE ET AL., MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEW, (1993), vol. 57, pages 451 - 509
    - HENSTRA ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 18, pages 200 - 206
    - J.R. PHILLIPS ET AL., BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (2015), vol. 190, pages 114 - 121
    - BERTSCH; MÜLLER, BIOTECHNOL BIOFUELS, (2015), vol. 8, page 210