Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464090

EP3464090 - POURING ELEMENT FOR A COMPOSITE PACKING AND COMPOSITE PACKAGING WITH A POURING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/15]POURING ELEMENT FOR A COMPOSITE PACKAGING AND A COMPOSITE PACKAGING COMPRISING A POURING ELEMENT
[2020/03]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIG Technology AG
Laufengasse 18
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HAUSER, Philippe
Hinterwuhrstrasse 7
8450 Andelfingen / CH
02 / RIGLING, Felix
Husackerstrasse 1
8505 Dettighofen / CH
03 / WASSUM, Markus
Rauhenbergstrasse 6
8263 Buch / CH
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17721417.810.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP61114
Priority number, dateDE20161011004631.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016110046
EP2016002020331.05.2016         Original published format: EP 16020203
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207227
Date:07.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464090
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65D5/74
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:AUSGIESSELEMENT FÜR EINE VERBUNDPACKUNG SOWIE VERBUNDPACKUNG MIT EINEM AUSGIESSELEMENT[2020/03]
English:POURING ELEMENT FOR A COMPOSITE PACKING AND COMPOSITE PACKAGING WITH A POURING ELEMENT[2020/03]
French:BEC VERSEUR POUR EMBALLAGE COMPOSITE ET EMBALLAGE COMPOSITE DOTÉ D'UN BEC VERSEUR[2020/03]
Former [2019/15]AUSGIEßELEMENT FÜR EINE VERBUNDPACKUNG SOWIE VERBUNDPACKUNG MIT EINEM AUSGIEßELEMENT
Former [2019/15]POURING ELEMENT FOR A COMPOSITE PACKAGING AND A COMPOSITE PACKAGING COMPRISING A POURING ELEMENT
Former [2019/15]ÉLÉMENT VERSEUR POUR UN EMBALLAGE COMPOSITE ET EMBALLAGE COMPOSITE DOTÉ D'UN ÉLÉMENT VERSEUR
Entry into regional phase08.11.2018National basic fee paid 
08.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
08.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDAI]WO2006050624  (SIG TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [XD] 1,2,13,14 * figure 1 * [A] 5-12 [I] 3,4;
 [XAI]DE102013101526  (SIG TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * figure 1 * [A] 5-12 [I] 3,4;
 [AD]WO2004000667  (SIG TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102006016113  (SIG TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 *
by applicantWO2007113215
 WO2004000667
 WO2006050624