Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469823

EP3469823 - UNIFIED AUTHENTICATION FOR HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei International Pte. Ltd.
51, Changi Business Park Central 2
No 07-08, The Signature
Singapore 486066 / SG
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Haiguang
20 Teletech Park
Singapore Science Park II
Science Park Road 03-31/32
Singapore 117674 / SG
02 / LI, Lichun
20 Teletech Park
Singapore Science Park II
Science Park Road 03-31/32
Singapore 117674 / SG
03 / KANG, Xin
20 Teletech Park
Singapore Science Park II
Science Park Road 03-31/32
Singapore 117674 / SG
04 / SHI, Jie
20 Teletech Park
Singapore Science Park II
Science Park Road 03-31/32
Singapore 117674 / SG
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17721476.428.03.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017SG50163
Priority number, dateSG20161005752P13.07.2016         Original published format: SG10201605752P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018013052
Date:18.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469823
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W12/06, H04W36/00, H04W84/04, H04W88/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:EINHEITLICHE AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG FÜR HETEROGENE NETZWERKE[2019/16]
English:UNIFIED AUTHENTICATION FOR HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS[2019/16]
French:AUTHENTIFICATION UNIFIÉE POUR RÉSEAUX HÉTÉROGÈNES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.08.2019Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
05.09.2019Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014181904  (CRAIG DAVID WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,27,29,31 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] * [I] 2,3,7,9,10,18,19,28,30;
 [XYI]WO2007102702  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [X] 27,29,31,32,35 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0089] * [Y] 5,6,8,12,13,15-17,21,22,24-26,36-39 [I] 1-4,7,9-11,14,18-20,23,28,30,33,34;
 [Y]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Architecture for Next Generation System (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.799, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20160608), vol. SA WG2, no. V0.5.0, pages 1 - 179, XP051123271 [Y] 5,6,8,12,13,15-17,21,22,24-26,36-39 * page 156, line 1 - page 159, line l; figures 6.12.1.1-3 *
    [XPYI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Security Context and Key Management", vol. SA WG3, no. Chennal (India); 20160725 - 20160729, (20160718), 3GPP DRAFT; S3_161005_PCR_SECURITY CONTEXT AND KEY MANAGEMENT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG3_Security/TSGS3_84_Chennai/Docs/, (20160718), XP051121970 [XP] 1,3,7,9,18,27,29,31 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,8,12,13,15-17,21,22,24-26,36-39 [I] 2,4,10,11,14,19,20,23,28,30,32-35