Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3469823


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.09.2019 Change: Validation states published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019 Change - extension states published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
07.09.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.08.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.08.2019 First examination report
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
26.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
07.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2019 Change - representative
11.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2019 Amendment by applicant
09.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
14.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
15.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication