Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463835

EP3463835 - VENTILATION UNIT FOR A VULCANIZATION MOLD OF A VEHICLE PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HASSELLÖF, Magnus
Bürgermeister-Bormann-Weg 7
30966 Hemmingen / DE
02 / DZICK, Jürgen
Altes Dorf 40
30926 Seelze / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Finger, Karsten
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Patente und Lizenzen
Postfach 169
30001 Hannover / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17722018.308.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP60851
Priority number, dateDE20161020991606.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016209916
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211515
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463835
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ENTLÜFTUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EINE VULKANISATIONSFORM EINES FAHRZEUGLUFTREIFENS[2019/15]
English:VENTILATION UNIT FOR A VULCANIZATION MOLD OF A VEHICLE PNEUMATIC TIRE[2019/15]
French:UNITÉ DE VENTILATION POUR UN MOULE DE VULCANISATION D'UN PNEUMATIQUE DE VÉHICULE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]DE102009059253  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 3 *;
 [XY]DE102011053207  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [Y] 2-5;
 [XY]EP2689920  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]; SNE DESHORS MOULAGE [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [Y] 2-5;
 [Y]CN201784083U  (SHANBIAO XUAN) [Y] 2-5 * figure - *
 [Y]  - Rohit M Kshirsagar ET AL, "Design and Analysis of Snap fit joint in Plastic part", International Journal of Innovative and Emerging Research in Engineering Volume, (20150514), page 83, URL: http://ijiere.com/FinalPaper/FinalPaperDesign and Analysis of Snap fit joint in Plastic part170326.pdf, (20170703), XP055387178 [Y] 2-5 * page 87 *
by applicantEP0774333