Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464699

EP3464699 - NONWOVEN FABRICS MADE OF BICOMPONENT FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MUELLER, Daniel
Arlesheimerstrasse 47
4053 Basel / CH
02 / VILLENEUVE, Sebastien
10 Rue de Village-Neuf
68330 HUNINGUE / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17722056.312.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP61424
Priority number, dateEP2016017218231.05.2016         Original published format: EP 16172182
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207244
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464699
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:D04H3/007, D04H3/147
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:AUS ZWEIKOMPONENTEN-FASERN HERGESTELLTE VLIESSTOFFE[2019/15]
English:NONWOVEN FABRICS MADE OF BICOMPONENT FIBERS[2019/15]
French:TISSUS NON TISSÉS COMPOSÉS DE FIBRES À DEUX COMPOSANTS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2010012769  (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claim - * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 9 *;
 [YD]WO0190113  (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007126994  (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] *
by applicantWO0190113