Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468828 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468828



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 177
23.01.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.01.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.12.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
20.12.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
20.12.2019 General authorisation Search / examination 1
20.12.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.10.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
22.10.2019 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 3
22.08.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.08.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.08.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.08.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
22.08.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
11.07.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Priority search results Search / examination 6
16.04.2019 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.02.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.02.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
29.06.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.06.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
21.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
17.05.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 6
09.05.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
09.05.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
09.05.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 13
09.05.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 1
09.05.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2
09.05.2017 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1
09.05.2017 Request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 5