Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3468828


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.01.2020 (Expected) grant published on  19.02.2020  [2020/08]
10.01.2020 Change - representative
03.01.2020 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.12.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.12.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.10.2019 Change - applicant published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
21.08.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
03.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
27.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
22.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
19.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication