Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468828

EP3468828 - STEERING WHEEL HAVING OPERATOR CONTROL ELEMENTS, AND METHOD FOR SETTING A FUNCTION FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.01.2020
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daimler AG
Mercedesstraße 120
70372 Stuttgart / DE
[2020/08]
Former [2019/48]For all designated states
Daimler AG
Mercedesstraße 120
70372 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Daimler AG
Mercedesstrasse 137
70327 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PRAMSOLER, Marc
Ebitzweg 44
70374 Stuttgart / DE
02 / CIERULLIES, Jens
Leharweg 5/2
75392 Deckenpfronn / DE
03 / HELLWIG, Volker
Erzbergerstrasse 35
70191 Stuttgart / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)JENSEN & SON
366-368 Old Street
London EC1V 9LT / GB
[2020/08]
Application number, filing date17722374.009.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP00566
Priority number, dateDE2016100702408.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016007024
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211438
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468828
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3468828
Date:19.02.2020
Language:DE
[2020/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60K37/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LENKRAD MIT BEDIENELEMENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINER FUNKTION FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG[2019/16]
English:STEERING WHEEL HAVING OPERATOR CONTROL ELEMENTS, AND METHOD FOR SETTING A FUNCTION FOR A VEHICLE[2019/16]
French:VOLANT MUNI D'ÉLÉMENTS DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE D'UNE FONCTION POUR VÉHICULE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2018National basic fee paid 
27.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
27.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2019Fee for grant paid
20.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE102004010310  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE102010005483  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1, 2, 8-13 *;
 [A]DE10346112  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantDE102004010310