Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465351

EP3465351 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VOLUME HOLOGRAM FILM HAVING SECURITY ELEMENTS FORMED AS TRANSFER SECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
For all designated states
OVD Kinegram AG
Zählerweg 11
6300 Zug / CH
[2019/27]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
For all designated states
OVD Kinegram AG
Zählerweg 12
6301 Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / LUTZ, Norbert
Am Waldfriedhof 7
90607 Rückersdorf / DE
02 / BURKHARDT, Markus
Friedenstrasse 16A
90513 Zirndorf / DE
03 / FÖRSTER, Karin
Sommerstrasse 3
90522 Oberasbach / DE
04 / SCHARFENBERG, Michael
Sudermannstrasse 24
Nürnberg 90455 / DE
05 / SCHILLING, Andreas
Flurstrasse 20
6332 Hagendorn (ZG) / CH
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17722412.802.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP60426
Priority number, dateDE20161010963325.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016109633
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202578
Date:30.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465351
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03H1/00, G03H1/02, G03H1/28
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VOLUMENHOLOGRAMMFOLIE MIT ALS ÜBERTRAGUNGSABSCHNITTE AUSGEBILDETEN SICHERHEITSELEMENTEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A VOLUME HOLOGRAM FILM HAVING SECURITY ELEMENTS FORMED AS TRANSFER SECTIONS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN FILM D'HOLOGRAMME VOLUMIQUE AYANT DES ÉLÉMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ FORMÉS EN TANT QUE SEGMENTS DE TRANSMISSION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US9321294  (SCHEUER JÜRGEN [DE]) [I] 1-39 * figures 1, 3-6 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 62 * * column 9, line 5 - column 12, line 24 * * column 13, line 21 - column 14, line 11 *;
 [A]US5162927  (MOSS GAYLORD E [US], et al) [A] 1,12-17,39 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 25 - column 8, line 68 *;
 [A]EP0516173  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,39 * column 6, line 37 - column 9, line 13; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPS59154482  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1,39 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003]; figures 1-6 *
by applicantUS2002174790