Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3462890

EP3462890 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SPHERICAL FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.10.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMO bvba
Nieuwendorpe 14
9900 Eeklo / BE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MOLLET, Sander
Spanjaardshoek 37B
9991 Adegem / BE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Brantsandpatents bvba
Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24
9051 Ghent / BE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17722504.231.03.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IB51848
Priority number, dateBE2016000523031.03.2016         Original published format: BE 165230
BE2016000574306.10.2016         Original published format: BE 165743
[2019/15]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017168378
Date:05.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3462890
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A22C7/00, A21C11/10
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KUGELFÖRMIGEN NAHRUNGSMITTELN[2019/15]
English:DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SPHERICAL FOOD PRODUCTS[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DES PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES SPHÉRIQUES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2019National basic fee paid 
27.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/15]
17.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2019/15]
27.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
27.02.2019Request for further processing filed
27.02.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
27.02.2019Request for further processing filed
27.02.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2019Decision despatched
27.02.2019Request for further processing filed
27.02.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
27.02.2019Request for further processing filed
27.02.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2019Decision despatched
27.02.2019Request for further processing filed
27.02.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.03.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1576883  (MACHF GEURTSEN DEVENTER B V [NL]) [X] 1-3,6,10-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0016] - [0025] - [0038] - [0043] - [0051] * * claims 1-18 * * figures 1-5, 7A-7J * [I] 4,5,7-9;
 [XI]EP2789239  (VEMAG MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,10-15 * the whole document * [I] 4,5,7-9;
 [A]DE395846  (EINAR OLAF NIELSEN SORENSEN) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3535735  (EGEE WALTER WARREN) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0610169  (HEST CORNELUS LUDOVICUS MARIA [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantCN204014936U
 WO2013104028