Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469514

EP3469514 - METHOD, IMAGING DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING A MEASURE OF AUTHENTICITY OF AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sicpa Holding SA
Av. de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DECOUX, Eric
Rue du Jura 8
1800 Vevey / CH
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel
Clarke, Modet & Co.
Suero de Quiñones, 34-36
28002 Madrid / ES
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17722834.316.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP61684
Priority number, dateEP2016017396110.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173961
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211548
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469514
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06F3/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Validation statesMA27.11.2018
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES MASSES DER AUTHENTIZITÄT EINES OBJEKTS[2019/16]
English:METHOD, IMAGING DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING A MEASURE OF AUTHENTICITY OF AN OBJECT[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE ET SYSTÈME SERVANT À GÉNÉRER UNE MESURE D'AUTHENTICITÉ D'UN OBJET[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.12.2018Observations by third parties
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006022059  (JUDS SCOTT [US]) [X] 1,6,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0073]; figures 9-12 *;
 [X]JP2008203738  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,6,9 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009283583  (COWBURN RUSSELL PAUL [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0176] - paragraph [0199] *;
 [A]US2013002713  (SOUPARIS HUGUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0137]; figures 2B,2C *;
 [A]US6203069  (OUTWATER CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * columns 3,4; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]GB2527508  (FURNESS ANTHONY [GB], et al) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - Miao Wang et al., "Nanomaterial-based barcode", vol. 7, doi:10.1039/c5nr01948f, (20150525), pages 11240 - 11247, Nanoscale, URL: http://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/2015/NR/C5NR01948F, (20161221), XP002765475 [X] 1,2,6,9 * page 11240 - page 11245 * [I] 3-5,7,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c5nr01948f
 [A]  - MANTORO TEDDY ET AL, "Real-Time Printed Document Authentication Using Watermarked QR Code", 2015 FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CYBER SECURITY, CYBER WARFARE, AND DIGITAL FORENSIC (CYBERSEC), IEEE, (20151029), doi:10.1109/CYBERSEC.2015.22, pages 68 - 72, XP032912994 [A] 1-9 * page 69 - page 71 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CyberSec.2015.22
 [A]  - HARSHA UMESH BABU ET AL, "Anti-counterfeiting using reflective micro structures - Based on random positioning of microstructures", ADVANCES IN OPTOELECTRONICS AND MICRO/NANO-OPTICS (AOM), 2010 OSA-IEEE-COS, IEEE, (20101203), doi:10.1109/AOM.2010.5767157, ISBN 978-1-4244-8393-8, pages 1 - 5, XP031865443 [A] 1-9 * page 1 - page 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AOM.2010.5767157