Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464908

EP3464908 - VALVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HYDAC Systems & Services GmbH
Industriestraße
66280 Sulzbach / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HINSBERGER, Kenny
Ahornweg 14
66287 Quierschied / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur
Patentanwälte
Bartels und Partner
Lange Straße 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17723007.510.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP00569
Priority number, dateDE2016100654525.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016006545
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202485
Date:30.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464908
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:F15B1/02, F15B1/033, F15B13/02, F16H61/4096, G05D16/00, F15B13/04
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VENTILVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:VALVE DEVICE[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME DE VANNES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]EP0602036  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 55 - column 8, line 20; figures 1-6 * [A] 2,5,6,8 [I] 4,7,9,10;
 [XI]DE3604410  (HYDROLUX SARL [LU]) [X] 1,3 * page 5, line 3 - page 10, line 8; figures 1-3 * [I] 4,7,9,10;
 [XI]DE112013006960T  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-22 * [I] 4,7,9,10;
 [A]DE102012005594  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102014000695
 DE102014219634