Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3472591 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3472591



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 175
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.01.2019 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
30.11.2018 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
30.11.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
20.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.11.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
20.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.11.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
31.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
31.10.2018 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
16.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
28.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 30
07.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
29.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
29.05.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
29.05.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
29.05.2017 Substitute sheet (R26) - Drawings PCT receiving Office 8
24.05.2017 Invitation to correct defects in the international application PCT receiving Office 2
24.05.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
09.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
09.05.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
09.05.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 5
09.05.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 15
09.05.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
09.05.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 6
09.05.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4