Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472591

EP3472591 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AND/OR CHARACTERIZING FLUID-BORNE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plair SA
Chemin des Aulx 18
1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KISELEV, Denis
Route de Saint-Julien 285
1258 Perly / CH
02 / KISELEVA, Svetlana
Route de Saint-Julien 285
1258 Perly / CH
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)KATZAROV S.A.
European Patent Attorneys
12, Avenue des Morgines
1213 Petit-Lancy / CH
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17723061.209.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP61070
Priority number, dateUS201662352171P20.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352171 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220249
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472591
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N15/14, G01N21/64, G01N15/10
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN UND/ODER CHARAKTERISIEREN VON FLUIDGETRAGENEN PARTIKELN[2019/17]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AND/OR CHARACTERIZING FLUID-BORNE PARTICLES[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION ET/OU DE CARACTÉRISATION DE PARTICULES PORTÉES PAR UN FLUIDE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2018National basic fee paid 
20.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
20.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2014377792  (DASGUPTA ANJAN KR [IN], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0006] , [0029] , [0038]; figures 1A,1D *;
 [A]US2013295568  (LINK DARREN ROY [US]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0070] , [0207] , [0214]; figures 30A,30B *;
 [A]JPS59102139  (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003]; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4348107  (LEIF ROBERT C) [A] 1-21 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 17; figure 1 * * column 3, line 10 - line 19 *;
 [A]US2014339444  (TANABE TETSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0037] , [0087] , [0117] , [0167]; figure 1A *