blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3455908

EP3455908 - CIRCUIT BOARD COAXIAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.11.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.02.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUBER+SUHNER AG
Degersheimerstrasse 14
9100 Herisau / CH
[2024/13]
Former [2019/12]For all designated states
Huber+Suhner AG
Degersheimerstrasse 14
9110 Herisau / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GARTMANN, Martin
Auwies 17
9242 Oberuzwil / CH
 [2019/12]
Representative(s)Rentsch Partner AG
Kirchenweg 8
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[2024/14]
Former [2019/12]Rentsch Partner AG
Bellerivestrasse 203
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date17723094.311.05.2017
[2019/12]
WO2017EP61408
Priority number, dateUS201662335096P12.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662335096 P
[2019/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017194715
Date:16.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3455908
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3455908
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.11.2017
ClassificationIPC:H01R12/91, H01R13/506, H01R24/54, // H01R12/73, H01R13/42, H01R103/00
[2023/48]
CPC:
H01R24/542 (EP,KR,US); H01R12/91 (EP,KR,US); H01R12/73 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/40 (US); H01R13/42 (EP,KR,US); H01R13/506 (EP,KR,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/12]H01R12/91, H01R13/506, H01R24/54, H01R12/73, H01R13/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/12]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEITERPLATTEN-KOAXIALVERBINDER[2019/12]
English:CIRCUIT BOARD COAXIAL CONNECTOR[2019/12]
French:CONNECTEUR COAXIAL DE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ[2019/12]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/12]
30.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2024Fee for grant paid
22.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[IA]DE3903886  (QUANTE AG [DE]) [I] 1,2,8-14 * column 1, lines 3-4 * * column 3, lines 35-48 * * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 63 * * column 5, lines 44-52 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 3-7;
 [XYI]WO2006115813  (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,12-14 * page 1, lines 4-5 * * page 14, lines 16-29 * * figures 1-110 * [Y] 2-7 [I] 11;
 [YA]US2014030936  (SANDOVAL ARTHUR G [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0034] * * figures 1A-11B *[A] 1,8-14
ExaminationDE3903886
 US6250960
by applicantUS4925403
 US5879177
 WO0052788
 EP1207592
 US2004038586
 US2006194465
 US2007026698
 CN2879475Y
 CN101459304
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.