Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465015

EP3465015 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE FOR PREPARING FOOD IN AN OUTER PART DISPLAYING OPTICAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BELIVEAU, Thomas Eric
Adelheidstraße 6
80798 München / DE
02 / SCHMIDT, Tobias
Brudermühlstr. 1
81371 München / DE
03 / PAWELEK, Caroline
Landsbergerstr. 205
80687 München / DE
04 / LEINMÜLLER, Elena
Uhlandstr. 4a
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
 [2019/15]
Application number, filing date17723096.812.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP61426
Priority number, dateDE20161020963102.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016209631
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207245
Date:07.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465015
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F24C7/08, F24C15/08, F24C15/00, F24C15/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:HAUSHALTSGERÄT ZUM ZUBEREITEN VON LEBENSMITTELN IN EINEM OPTISCHE INFORMATIONEN DARSTELLENDEN AUSSENTEIL[2019/15]
English:HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE FOR PREPARING FOOD IN AN OUTER PART DISPLAYING OPTICAL INFORMATION[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER POUR PRÉPARER DES ALIMENTS DANS UNE PARTIE EXTÉRIEURE AFFICHANT DES INFORMATIONS OPTIQUES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2336644  (INDESIT CO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4,13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0074]; figures 1-6 * [I] 7,10,11;
 [XYI]DE102010003103  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,12,13 * paragraphs [0031] - [0043]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 7,11;
 [X]DE102008041519  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,12,13 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]JP2012215327  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]WO2015155020  (BSH HAUSGERÄTE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figures 5,6 *;
 [Y]DE102006061739  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0020] , [0051] , [0052]; figures 2-7 *
by applicantDE102012224034
 DE102005047915