Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468821

EP3468821 - STRUCTURAL COMPONENT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A REINFORCING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde + Wiemann SE&Co. KG
Industriestraße 4 - 12
Dillenburg 35683 / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Werner
Edelmannstraße 33
63755 Alzenau / DE
02 / GEORG, Marcel
Adolf-Wurmbachstraße 17
57078 Siegen-Geisweid / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Müller, Eckhard
Mühlstrasse 9a
65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17723307.902.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP60357
Priority number, dateDE20161011057808.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110578
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211502
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468821
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60K1/04, B62D21/15, B62D29/00, B62D25/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:STRUKTURBAUTEIL FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT VERSTÄRKUNGSELEMENT[2019/16]
English:STRUCTURAL COMPONENT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A REINFORCING ELEMENT[2019/16]
French:PIÈCE STRUCTURALE POUR VÉHICULE À MOTEUR AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE RENFORT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2018National basic fee paid 
13.08.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
13.08.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2076421  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * figures 1, 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 28] , [0 32] , [0 34] , [0 35] * [I] 5,8-11;
 [Y]US2013270863  (YOUNG JONATHAN RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-7,9-12,15 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraphs [0031] , [0 40] , [0 46] *;
 [YA]US2013270864  (YOUNG JONATHAN RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-7,9-12,15 * figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0 33] * [A] 13,14;
 [A]DE102015116836  (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 4,6 * figures 6, 9-12 * * paragraph [0026] *
by applicantDE102005038463
 DE102013103719
 WO9854370