Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471591

EP3471591 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND MEDICAL OBSERVATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KASHIMA, Koji
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / UEMORI, Takeshi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / YAMANE, Masahito
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / HAYASHI, Tsuneo
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17723532.218.04.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017JP15613
Priority number, dateJP2016011968716.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016119687
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217107
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471591
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00, G06F19/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND MEDIZINISCHES BEOBACHTUNGSSYSTEM[2019/17]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, PROGRAM, AND MEDICAL OBSERVATION SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DES INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DES INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME ET SYSTÈME D'OBSERVATION MÉDICALE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
10.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010054576  (TSUJITA KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,10,16-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0082] *;
 [X]US2009023991  (GONO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8-15,22-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0361] - paragraph [0399] * * figures 3-4, 7, 24 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0133] * * paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0172] * * paragraph [0207] - paragraph [0233] *;
 [A]US2010256449  (KUBO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012088969  (TAKAHIRA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2012081087