Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471902

EP3471902 - ARRANGEMENT FOR TREATING A SLAB OR A STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.06.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Group GmbH
Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SEIDEL, Jürgen
Feuerdornweg 8
57223 Kreuztal / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Kross, Ulrich
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17723684.115.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP61558
Priority number, dateDE20161021083017.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016210830
DE20161021296715.07.2016         Original published format: DE102016212967
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215859
Date:21.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471902
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B21B45/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINER BRAMME ODER EINES BANDES[2019/17]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR TREATING A SLAB OR A STRIP[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE BRAME OU D'UNE BANDE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
17.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9711797  (HERMETIK HYDRAULIK AB [SE]; GAYDOUL JUERGEN [SE]; GIESELER WOLFGANG [D) [A] 1-18 * figure 1; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]CN204953553U  (INNER MONGOLIA BAOTOU STEEL UNION CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * figure 1 *;
 [A]CN201906744U  (HEBEI IRON AND STEEL CO LTD HANDAN BRANCH) [A] 1-18 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2011134193  (WISDRI ENG & RES INC LTD CHINA [CN], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102008020412  (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE68919618T
 DE19938705
 DE19817002
 CN2644038Y
 US2014047886
 KR20040021788
 KR20090005524U
 KR100899704B
 CN204486488U
 CN202539222U
 CN201669283U
 CN105170668
 CN102430599
 CN2723067Y