Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464654

EP3464654 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SENSING A CONVEYING RATE OF A LIQUID MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Group GmbH
Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÜRING, Andreas
Ursulastraße 61
45475 Mülheim / DE
02 / STARKE, Peter
Heckenstraße 69
47228 Duisburg / DE
03 / BERGS, Alexander
Kreyenesch 18
48429 Rheine / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kross, Ulrich
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17723696.516.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP61665
Priority number, dateDE20161020923827.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016209238
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202639
Date:30.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464654
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C21C5/50, B22D41/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN EINER FÖRDERRATE EINES FLÜSSIGEN MATERIALS[2019/15]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SENSING A CONVEYING RATE OF A LIQUID MATERIAL[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER LA VITESSE D'ÉCOULEMENT D'UNE MATIÈRE LIQUIDE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2012109354  (TERASHIMA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,18 * paragraphs [0033] - [0034] - [0 38] - [0042] - [0 75]; figures 1, 2, 5, 8 *;
 [X]US2016123669  (KEMENY FRANK L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,10,13-15,19 * figures 1,2; claims 1,6 *;
 [X]US2010116855  (NODA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,18 * paragraphs [0040] - [0041] - [0063] - [0065]; figures 1-5, 9 *;
 [X]DE3532763  (WOEHR GMBH UND CO KG GEB [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,10,13-15 * figure 1; claims 1,6 *;
 [X]US4135915  (KENNARD JOHN M) [X] 1,3,4,10,18 * abstract *;
 [X]US4191885  (NOVOA JORGE BECERRA [MX], et al) [X] 1,5,10,19 * abstract * * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 25 *;
 [X]US2009230159  (FLEISCHANDERL JOHANN [AT]) [X] 1,2,8,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032]; figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *
 [XI]  - YOSHIYUKI NODA ET AL, "Optimal Sequence Control of Automatic Pouring System in Press Casting Process by using Greensand Mold", SICE-ICCAS 2006 INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20061001), ISBN 978-89-950038-4-8, pages 4083 - 4088, XP031049981 [X] 1,3,4,10,18 * paragraph [0006]; figures 2, 4, 6, 10, 11 * * abstract * [I] 1-22
by applicantUS6004504
 DE102005023133
 EP2061612