Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465569

EP3465569 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USING NETWORK DATA IN AN AUTOMATED DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mastercard International, Inc.
2000 Purchase Street
Purchase, NY 10577 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KOHLI, Manoneet
11 Lake Street
White Plains, NY 10603 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Fountain, Sullivan , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17723802.919.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US28230
Priority number, dateUS20161516876131.05.2016         Original published format: US201615168761
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209850
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465569
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/08, G06Q30/06, H04L29/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON NETZWERKDATEN IN EINEM AUTOMATISIERTEN LIEFERSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USING NETWORK DATA IN AN AUTOMATED DELIVERY SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À UTILISER DES DONNÉES DE RÉSEAU DANS UN SYSTÈME DE LIVRAISON AUTOMATISÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2018National basic fee paid 
28.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
28.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2015081583  (BUTLER DAVID GEORGE [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0066] *;
 [A]US2016068264  (GANESH SHRIRAM [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] *;
 [A]WO2012027748  (VIVOTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 25 *