Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3465569 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3465569



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 159
08.11.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
24.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
24.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
24.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.01.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
18.10.2018 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
12.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.09.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.09.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 65
07.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 40
10.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2