Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3465569


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Change - classification published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
15.11.2019 Change - classification published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
02.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
27.07.2019 Amendment by applicant
17.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
11.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2018 Change - representative
29.09.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
15.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication