Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3448765

EP3448765 - DEVICE FOR PRINTING, SEVERING AND APPLYING SELF-ADHESIVE FLAT STRUCTURES, IN PARTICULAR LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
05.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Logopak Systeme GmbH & Co. KG
Dorfstr. 40
24628 Hartenholm / DE
[2019/10]
Inventor(s)01 / THURING, Lars
Holsatenallee 17E
24576 Bad Bramstedt / DE
02 / SCHWEDER, Carsten
Achtern Busch 13
24576 Weddelbrook / DE
03 / HAMER, Alexander
Jesuitengasse 128
50737 Köln / DE
 [2019/10]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/10]
Application number, filing date17723935.726.04.2017
[2019/10]
WO2017EP59994
Priority number, dateDE201620102279U28.04.2016         Original published format: DE 202016102279 U
[2019/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017186821
Date:02.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3448765
Date:06.03.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65C9/25, B65C9/28, B65C9/36
[2019/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/10]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEDRUCKEN, TRENNEN UND APPLIZIEREN VON SELBSTKLEBENDEN FLÄCHENGEBILDEN, INSBESONDERE ETIKETTEN[2019/10]
English:DEVICE FOR PRINTING, SEVERING AND APPLYING SELF-ADHESIVE FLAT STRUCTURES, IN PARTICULAR LABELS[2019/10]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION, DE SÉPARATION ET D'APPLICATION DE STRUCTURES PLANES AUTOCOLLANTES, EN PARTICULIER D'ÉTIQUETTES[2019/10]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2018National basic fee paid 
15.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/10]
15.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]US2492908  (VON HOFE GEORGE W) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 5, lines 8-50; figures 1-6 * [A] 14-16 [Y] 9-13 [I] 5-7;
 [Y]US2010006232  (DANGAMI AKIRA [JP]) [Y] 9-13 * paragraphs [0045] - [0046]; figures 1-9 *;
 [XI]US4390390  (MARGRAF DALLAS A ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,8 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 7; figures 1-4 * [I] 4,6,7;
 [XI]US4707211  (SHIBATA TOMOO [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8,14-16 * column 8, line 33 - line 52; figures 1-5 * [I] 2,3;
 [XI]USRE24097E  (HOFE VON GEORGE W.) [X] 1,6,8,14-16 * column 4, line 9 - line 41; figures 1-3 * [I] 2-5;
 [A]WO03086873  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]; THOMS GRAHAM E [AU]) [A] 9-13 * figures 1-14 *;
 [A]DE9304848U  (KRONES AG) [A] 1-16 * pages 1,5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE102004004827  (SCHREINER GROUP GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0036] , [0040] *
by applicantDE202013103136U
 EP1879751
    - "Bornholms Tidende", DäNISCHEN TAGESZEITUNG, page 15