blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3463661

EP3463661 - FLUID FLOW DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.10.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.06.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University Of Southampton
Highfield
Southampton, Hampshire SO17 1BJ / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / EASON, Robert
c/o University of Southampton
Research&Innovation Services
Building 37
Highfield Southampton SO17 1BJ / GB
02 / SONES, Collin
c/o University of Southampton
Research&Innovation Services
Building 37
Highfield Southampton SO17 1BJ / GB
03 / KATIS, Ioannis
c/o University of Southampton
Research&Innovation Services
Building 37
Highfield Southampton SO17 1BJ / GB
04 / HE, Peijun
c/o University of Southampton
Research&Innovation Services
Building 37
Highfield Southampton SO17 1BJ / GB
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
3 Noble Street
London EC2V 7BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date17724401.910.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017GB51288
Priority number, dateGB2016000967502.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201609675
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017207958
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463661
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3463661
Date:24.11.2021
Language:EN
[2021/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationIPC:B01L3/00, D21H25/06
[2019/15]
CPC:
B01L3/502707 (EP,GB,US); B01L3/502 (GB); B01L3/5023 (US);
B01L3/5027 (GB); D21H25/06 (EP,US); G03F7/0015 (US);
G03F7/095 (US); G03F7/0955 (US); G03F7/2006 (US);
G03F7/2053 (US); G03F7/70025 (US); G03F7/70383 (US);
G03F7/704 (US); B01L2200/12 (US); B01L2300/126 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSFLUSSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/15]
English:FLUID FLOW DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2021Fee for grant paid
19.10.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.10.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)25.08.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.05.2017
AL24.11.2021
AT24.11.2021
CY24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
IT24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
MC24.11.2021
MK24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SI24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
LU10.05.2022
[2024/22]
Former [2024/20]HU10.05.2017
AL24.11.2021
AT24.11.2021
CY24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
IT24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
MC24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SI24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
LU10.05.2022
Former [2024/18]HU10.05.2017
AL24.11.2021
AT24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
IT24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
MC24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SI24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
LU10.05.2022
Former [2023/27]AL24.11.2021
AT24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
IT24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
MC24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SI24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
LU10.05.2022
Former [2023/08]AL24.11.2021
AT24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
MC24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SI24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
LU10.05.2022
Former [2023/06]AL24.11.2021
AT24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
MC24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SI24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2023/01]AL24.11.2021
AT24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SI24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2022/49]AL24.11.2021
AT24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2022/35]AT24.11.2021
CZ24.11.2021
DK24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SK24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2022/34]AT24.11.2021
EE24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RO24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2022/33]AT24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
SM24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2022/25]AT24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
NO24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2022/24]AT24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
NL24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
SE24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
GR25.02.2022
IS24.03.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2022/23]AT24.11.2021
ES24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
HR24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
LV24.11.2021
PL24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
PT24.03.2022
Former [2022/22]AT24.11.2021
FI24.11.2021
LT24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
Former [2022/21]AT24.11.2021
RS24.11.2021
BG24.02.2022
Former [2022/19]BG24.02.2022
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010022324  (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1-53* figure -; claim - *;
 [X]GB2527779  (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB]) [X] 1-53 * figure -; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.