Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469822

EP3469822 - IMPROVED HANDLING OF IMS SERVICES AND EMERGENCY CALLS IN A ROAMING SCENARIO OF A USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  31.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LAUSTER, Reinhard
Südtirolerstraße 30
3100 St. Pölten / AT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Schwöbel, Thilo K. , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17724519.808.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP60953
Priority number, dateEP2016017356708.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173567
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211524
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469822
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/00, H04W36/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE HANDHABUNG VON IMS-DIENSTEN UND NOTRUFEN IN EINEM ROAMING-SZENARIO EINES BENUTZERGERÄTS[2019/16]
English:IMPROVED HANDLING OF IMS SERVICES AND EMERGENCY CALLS IN A ROAMING SCENARIO OF A USER EQUIPMENT[2019/16]
French:GESTION AMÉLIORÉE DE SERVICES IMS ET D'APPELS D'URGENCE DANS UN SCÉNARIO D'ITINÉRANCE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2013045176  (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE], et al) [Y] 2-7,10-12 * page 8, line 30 - page 10, line 17 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2016074747  (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 25 - line 32 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2011157366  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0023] *;
 [XY]  - GSMA, "Official Document IR.65 -IMS Roaming and Interworking Guidelines, Version 15.0", (20141028), URL: http://www.gsma.com/newsroom/wp-content/uploads/IR.65-v15.0.pdf, XP055224748 [X] 1,8,9,13-15 * paragraph 2 figure 2-2 figure 2-3 * [Y] 2-7,10-12
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Roaming Architecture for Voice over IMS with Local Breakout; Release 11", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.850, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110914), vol. SA WG2, no. V0.4.0, pages 1 - 35, XP050553771 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *