Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463239

EP3463239 - MOBILITY AID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  31.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otto Bock Mobility Solutions GmbH
Lindenstraße 13
07426 Königsee-Rottenbach / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HILDEBRAND, Dmitrij
Kirchenweg 34
76332 Bad Herrenalb / DE
02 / DÖRING, Florian
Gerberstraße 12
99089 Erfurt / DE
 [2019/18]
Former [2019/15]01 / HILDEBRAND, Dmitrij
Scheffelstraße 8
98693 Ilmenau / DE
02 / DÖRING, Florian
Gerberstraße 12
99089 Erfurt / DE
Representative(s)Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Straße 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17724569.322.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62214
Priority number, dateDE20161010975526.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016109755
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202745
Date:30.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463239
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61G5/08, A61G5/10
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MOBILITÄTSHILFE[2019/15]
English:MOBILITY AID[2019/15]
French:AIDE À LA MOBILITÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2018National basic fee paid 
13.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
13.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US4934722  (GOETZELMAN ELMER L [US]) [X] 1,4-7,10 * figures 4-8 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 8 * [I] 8;
 [XI]EP2106777  (MEYRA WILHELM MEYER GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * figures 4-7 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023] * [I] 3;
 [X]FR2948559  (RIU RAYNALD [FR]) [X] 1,4-10 * figures 1-7 * * column 5, line 13 - column 9, line 5 *
by applicantEP2213270
 CA2418491
 WO2014020378
 CH689177