Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3454785

EP3454785 - HEART VALVE WITH STENT HAVING VARYING CELL DENSITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  31.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
19.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Medical, Cardiology Division, Inc.
177 East County Road B
St. Paul, MN 55117 / US
[2019/12]
Inventor(s)01 / ERZBERGER, Gary
5375 Pineview Lane North
Plymouth, MN 55442 / US
02 / ALKHATIB, Yousef F.
5828 West 78th Street
Edina Minnesota 55439 / US
 [2019/17]
Former [2019/12]01 / ERZBERGER, Gary
3314 Pierce Street NE
Minneapolis Minnesota 55418 / US
02 / ALKHATIB, Yousef F.
5828 West 78th Street
Edina Minnesota 55439 / US
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
MTH The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/12]
Application number, filing date17725023.010.05.2017
[2019/12]
WO2017US31853
Priority number, dateUS201662336272P13.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662336272 P
[2019/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017196912
Date:16.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3454785
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017
[2019/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[2019/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/12]
TitleGerman:HERZKLAPPE MIT STENT MIT VARIIERENDEN ZELLDICHTEN[2019/12]
English:HEART VALVE WITH STENT HAVING VARYING CELL DENSITIES[2019/12]
French:VALVULE CARDIAQUE À STENT AYANT DES DENSITÉS CELLULAIRES VARIABLES[2019/12]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2018National basic fee paid 
08.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/12]
08.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2009094188  (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12-14,17,21 * paragraphs [0057] , [0062] , [0077]; figures 1,2,32,33 * [Y] 7-9,18-20 [I] 4,5,10,11,15,16;
 [Y]WO2015179468  (ST JUDE MEDICAL CARDIOLOGY DIV [US]) [Y] 7-9,18-20 * paragraphs [0021] , [0031] , [0042] , [0044]; figure - *;
 [XI]US2011238168  (PELLEGRINI GIANFRANCO M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,12-14,17,18,21 * paragraphs [0043] , [0047] , [0048]; figure - * [I] 4,15;
 [XI]US2015272737  (DALE THEODORE PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,12,17,18,21 * paragraphs [0067] , [0068] , [0117]; figures 7A-7C; claims 10,11 * [I] 10;
 [XI]US2011264196  (SAVAGE PADRAIG [IE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,12-14,16 * paragraphs [0025] , [0027]; figure -; claims 10-12 * [I] 4,6-9,15,17-19,21;
 [X]CN101961273B  (HANGZHOU VENUS MEDICAL INSTR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,12,13,16 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0074] - [0076]; figures 1-4 *