Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464442

EP3464442 - RELEASE COMPONENTS TO INCREASE ANTI-ADHESION PROPERTIES OF THERMOPLASTIC PACKAGING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.01.2020
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant International Ltd
Rothausstrasse 61
4132 Muttenz / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHELERO, Natascha
Krifteler Strasse 21
65795 Hattersheim / DE
02 / MULLER, Thierry
17 Rue du commerce
9026 Ettelbruck / LU
03 / MARSON, Angelica
Schulstrasse 52
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
04 / SACCHI, Alessandra Stella
Via Varesina 92
20156 Milano / IT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Jacobi, Carola
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent & License Management Chemicals
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17725228.522.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62256
Priority number, dateEP2016017097424.05.2016         Original published format: EP 16170974
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202764
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464442
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08K3/22, C08K5/053, C08K5/103, C08K3/26
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ANTIHAFTKOMPONENTEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ANTI-ADHÄSIONSEIGENSCHAFTEN VON THERMOPLASTISCHEM VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL[2020/04]
English:RELEASE COMPONENTS TO INCREASE ANTI-ADHESION PROPERTIES OF THERMOPLASTIC PACKAGING MATERIAL[2019/15]
French:COMPOSANTS POUR AUGMENTER LA LIBÉRATION DES PROPRIÉTÉS ANTI-ADHÉSION DE MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE THERMOPLASTIQUE[2020/04]
Former [2019/15]AUSRÜCKKOMPONENTEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ADHÄSIONSSCHUTZEIGENSCHAFTEN VON THERMOPLASTISCHEM VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL
Former [2019/15]COMPOSANTS ANTIADHÉSIFS POUR RENFORCEMENT DES PROPRIÉTÉS ANTIADHÉSIVES D'UN MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE THERMOPLASTIQUE
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP2230270  (KWH PLAST AB OY [FI]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * claims 1-3,7-10,13 *;
 [AD]EP1362792  (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]EP2662407  (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] * * claim 1 *