Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464837

EP3464837 - ACTUATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Intelligent Power Limited
30 Pembroke Road
Dublin 4 / IE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CECCHI, Michele
Via San Domenico 34
10122 Torino / IT
02 / BUONOCORE, Gennaro
Via San Quintino 38
10121 Turin / IT
03 / DALLACQUA, Fabrizio
Corso Torino n. 3/C Grugliasco (Torino)
10095 Torino / IT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Eaton IP Group EMEA
c/o Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH
Route de la Longeraie 7
1110 Morges / CH
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17725253.323.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62413
Priority number, dateGB2016000911324.05.2016         Original published format: GB 201609113
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202845
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464837
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:F01L1/18, F01L13/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:ACTUATION APPARATUS[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL D'ACTIONNEMENT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2013156610  (EATON SRL [IT]) [AD] 1,5-7,12,14,21,24 * page 1, line 9 - line 26 * * page 10, line 15 - line 26 * * figures 6a-7b *;
 [A]US2005092273  (CECUR MAJO [IT] ET AL) [A] 1,3,5,7-13,21-24 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *;
 [A]GB2526554  (EATON SRL [IT]) [A] 1,5,6,12,14,21,24 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 7 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5653198  (DIGGS MATTHEW BRYNE [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7,12,14,24 * page 1, line 35 - line 52 * * page 4, line 35 - line 60 * * figure - *
by applicantWO2013156610