Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3458535

EP3458535 - PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING IN-LINE POLYOLEFIN BASED ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS, AND ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS AND FILMS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Equistar Chemicals LP
Suite 700
Lyondellbasell Tower
1221 McKinney Street
Houston, TX 77010 / US
[2019/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BOTROS, Maged, G.
c/o Lyondellbasell Legal Ip Department
1221 Mckinney Street
Suite 700
Houston, TX 77010 / US
02 / PODBORNY, William, R.
c/o Lyondellbasell Legal Ip Department
1221 Mckinney Street
Suite 700
Houston, TX 77010 / US
03 / CORCORAN, Lindsay, E.
c/o Lyondellbasell Legal Ip Department
1221 Mckinney Street
Suite 700
Houston, TX 77010 / US
 [2019/13]
Representative(s)Sacco, Marco
Equistar Chemicals, LP IP
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
P.le Privato G. Donegani, 12, Casella Postale 19
44122 Ferrara / IT
[2019/13]
Application number, filing date17725462.012.05.2017
[2019/13]
WO2017US32379
Priority number, dateUS201662339247P20.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662339247 P
[2019/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017200867
Date:23.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3458535
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09J123/08, B32B27/32, C08L51/06
[2019/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/13]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR INLINE-HERSTELLUNG VON POLYOLEFINBASIERTEN KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND FOLIEN DARAUS[2019/13]
English:PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING IN-LINE POLYOLEFIN BASED ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS, AND ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS AND FILMS THEREOF[2019/13]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION EN LIGNE DE COMPOSITIONS ADHÉSIVES À BASE DE POLYOLÉFINE, ET COMPOSITIONS ADHÉSIVES ET FILMS ASSOCIÉS[2019/13]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2018National basic fee paid 
20.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/13]
20.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US8637159  (BOTROS MAGED G [US]) [Y] 1-20 * claims 1,5-7 * * examples 1-4 * * column 2, line 7 - line 26 * * column 5, line 1 - line 3 * * column 5, line 9 - line 19 *;
 [Y]WO2004022661  (MSI TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0029] *;
 [YD]WO2012025379  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [YD] 1-20 * claims 1,5,8,9 * * page 1, paragraph last - page 2, paragraph second *