Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464128

EP3464128 - PIN RETENTION FOR CONVEYOR MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Habasit AG
Römerstrasse 1
4153 Reinach / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / RICHARDSON, Andrew
13 Rue de la Fontaine
68220 Michelbach-le-Haut / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17725582.523.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62459
Priority number, dateUS20161516364224.05.2016         Original published format: US201615163642
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202862
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464128
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65G17/08, B65G17/40
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:STIFTRÜCKHALTUNG FÜR FÖRDERMODULE[2019/15]
English:PIN RETENTION FOR CONVEYOR MODULES[2019/15]
French:MAINTIEN DE BROCHES POUR MODULES DE TRANSPORTEUR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
14.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2014326584  (VISCONTI ENRICO [IT] ET AL) [X] 1,2,21 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 6A-7C * [Y] 8-10,26,27 [I] 22,33;
 [Y]US2010175969  (MARSETTI SERGIO [IT]) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * page 1, paragraph 0017 - paragraph 0021 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]WO03078124  (UNI CHAINS AS [DK]; DMAKJAER POUL ERIK [DK]) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * page 18, line 21 - page 20, line 11 * * figures 6-9 *;
 [YA]EP2050347  (GD SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-5,12,16-20 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * figure - * [A] 28-32;
 [Y]WO2015025615  (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO [JP]; TSUBAKI YAMAKYU CHAIN CO [JP]) [Y] 12,16-20 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-17 *;
 [XYI]US6978885  (SCHUMACHER JEFFREY A [US]) [X] 28-32 * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 30 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 8-10,16-20,26,27 [I] 33