Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464386

EP3464386 - METHOD FOR CLEAVING AMIDE BONDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.10.2019 [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Galderma S.A.
Zugerstrasse 8
6330 Cham / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / OLSSON, Johan
Ulvsunda Slottsväg 15
167 33 Bromma / SE
02 / HARRIS, Craig, Steven
3142 Route de Valbonne
06410 Biot / FR
03 / JING JING, Laura
33Bd Dugommier
06600 Antibes / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17725638.530.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63029
Priority number, dateEP2016017222531.05.2016         Original published format: EP 16172225
EP2016017224131.05.2016         Original published format: EP 16172241
EP2016017225431.05.2016         Original published format: EP 16172254
WO2016EP8277428.12.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/082774
WO2016EP8277828.12.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/082778
WO2016EP8278128.12.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/082781
WO2016EP8277028.12.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/082770
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207564
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464386
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08B37/00, C08B37/08, C08L5/00, C08J3/075
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SPALTUNG VON AMIDVERBINDUNGEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR CLEAVING AMIDE BONDS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CLIVAGE DE LIAISONS AMIDE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
06.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.09.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO02081739  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,15-23,25,28,31 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 29; claims 1-38; figures 1-4; examples * [I] 11-14,24,26,27,29,30;
 [XI]US2015045573  (CHENG WEIJUN [US], et al) [X] 1-10,15-23,25,28,31 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; [0008]-[0019]; claims 1-20; figures 1-13; examples * [I] 11-14,24,26,27,29,30;
 [XI]WO02082078  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,15-23,25,28,31 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 9; claims 1-45; figures 1 and 2; examples * [I] 11-14,24,26,27,29,30;
 [XI]US6132750  (PERRIER ERIC [FR], et al) [X] 1-10,15-23,25,28,31 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract, column 3, line 15 - column 11, line 10; claims 1-45; examples * [I] 11-14,24,26,27,29,30;
 [XI]WO9711958  (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [X] 1-10,15-23,25,28,31 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 7, line 10 - page 14, line 20; claims 1-16; figures 1-33; examples * [I] 11-14,24,26,27,29,30;
 [A]EP2682409  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - ZHU ET AL, "Selective cleavage of isoaspartyl peptide bonds by hydroxylamine after methyltransferase priming", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070331), vol. 364, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2007.02.013, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 1 - 7, XP022005959 [X] 1-10,15-23,25,28,31 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; materials and methods; results and discussion; figures 1-5; tables 1 and 2 * [I] 11-14,24,26,27,29,30

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2007.02.013
 [XI]  - E CANOVA-DAVIS ET AL, "Chemical heterogeneity as a result of hydroxylamine cleavage of a fusion protein of human insulin-like growth factor I", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, GB, (19920701), vol. 285, no. 1, doi:10.1042/bj2850207, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 207 - 213, XP055368110 [X] 1-10,15-23,25,28,31 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; materials and methods; results; figures 1-10; tables 1-3 * [I] 11-14,24,26,27,29,30

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj2850207
 [A]  - TSIGOS I ET AL, "Chitin deacetylases: new, versatile tools in biotechnology", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20000701), vol. 18, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0167-7799(00)01462-1, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 305 - 312, XP004908536 [A] 1-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(00)01462-1