Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3462967

EP3462967 - CONNECTION DEVICE FOR STRAPS, OBJECTS, PIECES OF CLOTHING AND ACCESSORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Readynovation SAS
5 rue de la Tour d'Auvergne
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LEBRETON, Yann
5 rue d'Aurion
93110 Rosny Sous Bois / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Gevers & Orès
Immeuble le Palatin 2
3-5 Cours du Triangle
92036 Puteaux La Défense cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Gevers & Orès
41 avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date17725639.330.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63032
Priority number, dateFR2016000087030.05.2016         Original published format: FR 1600870
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207566
Date:07.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3462967
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A44B11/25
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR GURTE, OBJEKTE, TEILE VON KLEIDUNGSSTÜCKEN ODER ACCESSOIRES[2019/15]
English:CONNECTION DEVICE FOR STRAPS, OBJECTS, PIECES OF CLOTHING AND ACCESSORIES[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION POUR SANGLES, OBJETS, PARTIES DE VÊTEMENTS ET ACCESSOIRES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
30.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US5203058  (KRAUSS MARK [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - line 56 * * column 2, line 21 - line 53 *;
 [A]GB2165299  (ITW DE FRANCE) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 69 - line 89 *;
 [A]US4779315  (KOHUS LOUIS M [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 52 *;
 [A]JPS6074615U  (-) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *