Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469216

EP3469216 - PUMP ASSEMBLY, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill, Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYLOCK, James Alexander
Edwards Limited
15 Marshall Road
Hampden Park
Eastbourne Sussex BN22 9BA / GB
02 / PATEY, Alexander James
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
03 / SIMMONDS, Michael
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Norton, Ian Andrew
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill
West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17725727.616.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB51362
Priority number, dateGB2016001024413.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610244
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216514
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469216
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F04D19/04, F04D27/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:PUMPENANORDNUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM[2019/16]
English:PUMP ASSEMBLY, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM[2019/16]
French:ENSEMBLE POMPE, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE202015003927U  (OERLIKON LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10,12,13,15,17-21,23-25,27-32,34-38 * paragraphs [04.8] - [0010] - [0018] , [0022] , [0029] - [0032] * * figure 1 * [I] 3,11,14,16,22,26,33;
 [XI]EP0851127  (VARIAN SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11-13,15,16,19,20,24,25,27-30,33-38 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, lines 13-26 * * page 10, lines 23-26 * * claims 1,12,14,16 * * figures 2,3,4a,4b * [I] 3,8-10,17,18,21-23,26,31,32;
 [XI]US2004064291  (SAMATA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-13,15,19,21,24,25,27-29,33-38 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0024] , [0025] , [0029] - [0033] - [0041] - [0045] - [0056] , [0057] * * figures 2,3,6,7 * [I] 3,7-9,16-18,20,22,23,26,30,31;
 [XI]GB2507501  (EDWARDS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-6,12-16,19-21,24,25,27-29,34-38 * page 2, lines 11-16 * * page 3, lines 1-5 * * page 4, lines 4-18 * * page 7, line 20 - page 9, line 10 * * page 13, lines 4-12 * * figures 1,5,6 * [I] 3,9,18,22,23,26,31