Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468648

EP3468648 - AEROSOL DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nicoventures Holdings Limited
Globe House
1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / FRASER, Rory
Globe House
1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
02 / JAIN, Siddhartha
Globe House
1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17725749.019.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017GB51406
Priority number, dateGB2016001022013.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610220
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216516
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468648
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M15/06, A24F47/00, A61M11/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AEROSOLABGABEVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:AEROSOL DELIVERY DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN AÉROSOL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO9731721  (MEDIX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,14 * the whole document, and especially figure 1 * [I] 2,12,13;
 [XI]CA2257618  (MEDIC AID LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-10,12,14,15 * the whole document, and especially the figures * [I] 2,4,7,11,13;
 [XA]US2011265806  (ALARCON RAMON [US], et al) [X] 15 * the whole document, and especially figure 1A * [A] 1-14;
 [A]US2015282527  (HENRY JR RAYMOND CHARLES [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures *;
 [A]WO2014012907  (NICOVENTURES HOLDING LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures *;
 [A]WO2014012906  (NICOVENTURES HOLDING LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures *;
 [A]US2013220315  (CONLEY GREGORY D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures *;
 [A]WO2016066635  (JT INT SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures *;
 [A]GB2524779  (CIGTRONICA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially the figures *;
 [A]EP0461281  (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document, and especially figures 1-2 *