EP3465141 - PARTICLE CHARACTERISATION IN OPEN OPTICAL RESONATOR CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 0JB / GB | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 0JB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRICHET, Aurélien 29 Norham Road Oxford OX2 6SQ / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Jason Michael Department of Materials University of Oxford 16 Parks Road Oxford OX1 3PH / GB | 03 /
VALLANCE, Claire Physical and Theoretical Chemistry Laboratory University of Oxford South Parks Road Oxford OX1 3QZ / GB | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Raynor, Simon Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB | ||
Former [2019/15] | Atkinson, Ian Anthony Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17725758.1 | 22.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017GB51427 | Priority number, date | GB20160009017 | 23.05.2016 Original published format: GB 201609017 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017203224 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465141 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3465141 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G01N21/39, B01L3/00, G02B21/32, G01N21/77 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G01N15/1484 (EP,KR,US);
G01N15/1436 (EP,KR,US);
B01L3/50273 (EP,KR,US);
B01L3/502761 (EP,KR);
G01N15/1456 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0809 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,KR);
B01L2300/168 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2400/0454 (EP,KR);
G02B21/32 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON TEILCHEN IN EINEM OFFENEN HOHLRAUM EINES OPTISCHEN RESONATORS | [2019/15] | English: | PARTICLE CHARACTERISATION IN OPEN OPTICAL RESONATOR CAVITY | [2019/15] | French: | CARACTÉRISATION DE PARTICULES DANS UNE CAVITÉ OUVERTE DE RÉSONATEUR OPTIQUE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 31.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2017 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | LU | 22.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.05.2017 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5608519 (GOURLEY PAUL L [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5903347 (GIRVIN KENNETH L [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 44 ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2013164642 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB]) [A] 1-33 * page 16, line 1 - line 4 * * page 15, line 23 - line 32 * * page 11, line 11 - line 20 *; | [XI] - N. KIESEL ET AL, "Cavity cooling of an optically levitated submicron particle", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20130812), vol. 110, no. 35, doi:10.1073/pnas.1309167110, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14180 - 14185, XP055391773 [X] 1 * section: Materials and Methods * * Figure 1 and caption * [I] 2-33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1309167110 | [XP] - A. A. P. TRICHET ET AL, "Nanoparticle Trapping and Characterization Using Open Microcavities", NANO LETTERS, US, (20161012), vol. 16, no. 10, doi:10.1021/acs.nanolett.6b02433, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 6172 - 6177, XP055391481 [XP] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.nanolett.6b02433 |