Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3443482

EP3443482 - CLASSIFYING ENTITIES IN DIGITAL MAPS USING DISCRETE NON-TRACE POSITIONING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/08]
Inventor(s)01 / RACZ, David L.
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/08]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/08]
Application number, filing date17725827.415.05.2017
[2019/08]
WO2017US32576
Priority number, dateUS20161515912419.05.2016         Original published format: US201615159124
[2019/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017200889
Date:23.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3443482
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2019/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/08]
TitleGerman:KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON EINHEITEN BEI DIGITALEN KARTEN MITTELS DISKRETER NICHTVERFOLGUNGS-POSITIONIERUNGSDATEN[2019/08]
English:CLASSIFYING ENTITIES IN DIGITAL MAPS USING DISCRETE NON-TRACE POSITIONING DATA[2019/08]
French:CLASSIFICATION D'ENTITÉS SUR DES CARTES NUMÉRIQUES AU MOYEN DE DONNÉES DE POSITIONNEMENT SANS TRACE DISCRÈTES[2019/08]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2018National basic fee paid 
16.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/08]
16.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2015150855  (BASALAMAH ANAS M [SA]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0001]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]US2015161439  (KRUMM JOHN C [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] *
 [I]  - JUN LI ET AL, "Mining Trajectory Data and Geotagged Data in Social Media for Road Map Inference : Mining Social Media for Road Map Inference", TRANSACTIONS IN GIS, GB, (20140115), vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1111/tgis.12072, ISSN 1361-1682, pages 1 - 18, XP055377968 [I] 1-14 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2.2.1 * * page 8, paragraph 3.1 - page 13, paragraph 3.2.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/tgis.12072
 [I]  - Maribel Yasmina Santos ET AL, "Automatic Classification of Location Contexts with Decision Trees", Conference on Mobile and Ubiquitous Systems (CSMU 2006), (20060629), URL: http://ubicomp.algoritmi.uminho.pt/csmu/proc/santos-132.pdf, (20170616), XP055382186 [I] 1-14 * page 79, paragraph 1 - page 84, paragraph 4 *
 [A]  - ALIREZA FATHI ET AL, Detecting Road Intersections from GPS Traces, GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SCIENCE, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 56 - 69, (20100914), ISBN 978-3-642-15299-3, XP019149355 [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 4.2 *
 [A]  - BRUNTRUP R ET AL, "Incremental map generation with GPS traces", 2005 IEEE INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS CONFERENCE (ITSC) ; VIENNA, AUSTRIA; 13 - 16 SEPTEMBER 2005, EEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050913), doi:10.1109/ITSC.2005.1520084, ISBN 978-0-7803-9215-1, pages 413 - 418, XP010843059 [A] 1-14 * page 413, paragraph 1 - page 416, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITSC.2005.1520084