Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3443482 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3443482



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 112
03.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.05.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
03.05.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
03.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
04.12.2018 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
30.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.09.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.12.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
23.11.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
23.11.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24
03.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.07.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3