Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3443482


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.07.2019 Change: Validation states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019 Change - extension states published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
18.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.05.2019 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
18.01.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
18.01.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
18.01.2019 Request for examination filed published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
19.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
26.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.2018 Change - representative
29.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
02.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication