Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463181

EP3463181 - ENCAPSULATED ABSORBER AND TEMPORAL ACTIVATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biotronik AG
Ackerstrasse 6
8180 Bülach / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / RISCH, Fabian
Vorstadt 13
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
02 / WESSELMANN, Matthias
Chapfstrasse 10
8455 Ruedlingen / CH
03 / WESSBECHER, Stefan
Allmendstrasse 23
8180 Bülach / CH
04 / QUINT, Bodo
Hauptstrasse 38
79802 Dettighofen / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Randoll, Sören
Biotronik Corporate Services SE
Corporate Intellectual Property
Sieversufer 7 - 9
12359 Berlin / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17725879.504.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP60682
Priority number, dateDE20161010939423.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016109394
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202589
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463181
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00, B65D81/26
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERKAPSELTER ABSORBER UND TEMPORÄRE AKTIVIERUNG DAVON[2019/15]
English:ENCAPSULATED ABSORBER AND TEMPORAL ACTIVATION THEREOF[2019/15]
French:ABSORBEUR ENCAPSULÉ ET ACTIVATION TEMPORELLE DE CELUI-CI[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2018National basic fee paid 
15.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
07.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2004066876  (AVE CONNAUGHT [IE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 2 - page 7, line 23; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1867298  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0126]; figure 1 *