Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465828

EP3465828 - SPRING TERMINAL FOR A CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 26
32758 Detmold / DE
[2019/43]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HERRMANN, Michael
Hinter den Pinneichen 11
32756 Detmold / DE
02 / CLASSEN, Constantin
Peckenweg 7
32758 Detmold / DE
03 / STJEPANOVIC, Karlo
Libellenweg 12
33609 Bielefeld / DE
04 / FEHLING, Stephan
Hans-Hüls-Str. 6
32791 Lage / DE
05 / HANNING, Walter
Am Langen Grund 66
32758 Detmold / DE
06 / OESTERHAUS, Jens
Am Höwel 4
32760 Detmold / DE
07 / WALDHOFF, Marco
Am Kösterberg 6
32839 Steinheim / DE
08 / FRICKE, Herbert
Stembergstr. 44
32760 Detmold / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17725955.326.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62749
Priority number, dateDE201620102850U30.05.2016         Original published format: DE 202016102850 U
DE201620105824U18.10.2016         Original published format: DE 202016105824 U
WO2016EP8055812.12.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/080558
DE201720101670U22.03.2017         Original published format: DE 202017101670 U
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017207429
Date:07.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3465828
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/48, H01R13/193
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FEDERKRAFTKLEMME FÜR LEITER[2019/15]
English:SPRING TERMINAL FOR A CONDUCTOR[2019/15]
French:BORNE À RESSORT POUR CONDUCTEUR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2018National basic fee paid 
17.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
17.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE102004001202  (BALS ELEKTROTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,16,20,21,23-26 * the whole document * [Y] 7-15,17-19 [I] 2,22;
 [YD]DE102008039232  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [YD] 7-15,17-19 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 10-16 *;
 [XI]EP0899818  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 2,3,20,21,23 * the whole document * [I] 22
by applicantUS7997915
 EP2768079
 DE102008039232
 WO2015180950