Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3465828 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3465828



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 480
23.09.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
17.09.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
17.09.2019 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
17.09.2019 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
26.08.2019 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
17.07.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
12.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
12.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 20
12.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 21
12.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
10.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
10.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
10.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 20
10.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 21
10.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
13.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.12.2018 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 12
21.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 15
17.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
17.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 15
17.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
21.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
21.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
21.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
25.01.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
25.01.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
25.01.2018 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
02.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
02.01.2018 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
07.12.2017 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 47
04.12.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
04.12.2017 International Search Report - copy in English for the IB International Searching Authority 2
20.11.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
20.11.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
20.11.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 10
11.08.2017 Reply to invitation to pay additional fees International Searching Authority 1
08.08.2017 Reply to invitation to pay additional fees International Searching Authority 1
01.08.2017 Partial International Search Report International Searching Authority 3
01.08.2017 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results International Searching Authority 7
08.06.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
02.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 6
31.05.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
26.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
26.05.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
26.05.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 5
26.05.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 21
26.05.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
26.05.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 19
26.05.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 5