Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3465828


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.09.2019 Change - applicant published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
02.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
11.07.2019 Amendment by applicant
29.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
11.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
19.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2018 Amendment by applicant
17.12.2018 Change - representative
17.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
26.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
05.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication