Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3465828 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780032914 EP17725955



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2017207429Global Dossier 25.01.2018A3
WO2017207429 07.12.2017A2
Priority number Date
DE202016105824 18.10.2016
WO2016EP80558 12.12.2016
DE202016102850 30.05.2016
DE202017101670 22.03.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019319374Global Dossier 17.10.2019A1
Priority number Date
DE202016105824 18.10.2016
WO2016EP80558 12.12.2016
DE202016102850 30.05.2016
DE202017101670 22.03.2017
WO2017EP62749 26.05.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019517716Global Dossier 24.06.2019A
Priority number Date
DE202016105824 18.10.2016
WO2016EP80558 12.12.2016
DE202016102850 30.05.2016
DE202017101670 22.03.2017
WO2017EP62749 26.05.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109314324Global Dossier 05.02.2019A
Priority number Date
DE202016105824 18.10.2016
WO2016EP80558 12.12.2016
DE202016102850 30.05.2016
DE202017101670 22.03.2017
WO2017EP62749 26.05.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3465828Global Dossier 10.04.2019A2
Priority number Date
DE202016105824 18.10.2016
WO2016EP80558 12.12.2016
DE202016102850 30.05.2016
DE202017101670 22.03.2017
WO2017EP62749 26.05.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202017103185U 01.09.2017U1
Priority number Date
DE202016105824 18.10.2016
DE202016102850 30.05.2016
DE202017101670 22.03.2017